open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:12-40639-abf13
    Party Name:Richard E. Gordon, Jr. -BELOW MED-
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m) AMENDED]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion (AMENDED)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 11/12/13]
    Date Published:September 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:August 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certification About a Financial Management Course (FMC)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ntc Final Cure Mortgage Payment APPROVED]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response in Agreement to Ntc of Final Cure Pmt Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection to Claim - DENIED]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?287474
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =