open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-21110-drd13
    Party Name:Gregory NMN Warren --BELOW MED--
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 9/11/12/13]
    Date Published:July 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ntc Final Cure Mortgage Payment APPROVED]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response in Agreement to Ntc of Final Cure Pmt Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:April 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certification About a Financial Management Course (FMC)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:April 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Pmts]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion Dismiss Case for Default]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Setting Dividend (tm)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Amd Direct Debtor Pay]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Verification by Debtor]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Trustee Motion to Deny Confirmation]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Vacating the Dismissal and Reinstating Case (o)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?315563
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =