open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-20805-drd13
    Party Name:Teneya Crystal Townsend --ABOVE MED--
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 9/11/12/13]
    Date Published:December 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Address Added or Changed - text entry]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitute Creditor Attorney - text only]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Incur Debt]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Shorten Time (o)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Consent to Motion to Expedite (text)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Shorten Time]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Incur Debt for Vehicle (NO notice)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post Confirmation Fees (o)]
    Date Published:March 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Withdraw Document (text entry)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post-Confirmation Fees]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Relief from Stay (Fee Due)]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ntc & Order Setting Hearing on Stay]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?313556
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =