open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:12-21381-drd13
    Party Name:Rebecca Faithe Griffith - BELOW MED -
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m) AMENDED]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion (AMENDED)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 11/12/13]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Deposit for Court Registry]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Deposit Funds into Registry]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Deposit Funds into Registry (m)]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certification About a Financial Management Course (FMC)]
    Date Published:June 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion Dismiss Case for Default]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Direct Employer Pay Tr]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post Confirmation Fees (o)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?294613
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =