open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:13-61730-can13
    Party Name:Jennifer Leanne Kennedy ***ABOVE MED***
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Vacating the Dismissal and Reinstating Case (o)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Vacate Dismissal and Reinstate Case]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Striking Document]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Confirming Amended 13 Plan (NOT initial)(tm)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Amd Direct Debtor Pay]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Trustee Motion to Deny Confirmation]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Verification by Debtor]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Springfield Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion Dismiss Case for Default]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Pmts]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post-Confirmation Fees]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitute Debtor Attorney]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post Confirmation Fees (o)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?307450
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =