open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-42289-can11
    Party Name:Jeffery Scott Woods and Michelle Victoria Woods
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Substitute Creditor Attorney - text only]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Substitution Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:March 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 11/12/13]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree - Ch 11]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Ch 11 Individual Debtor Discharge]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice Striking Document - B423]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certification About a Financial Management Course (FMC)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Discharge]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice Striking Document]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Substitute Creditor Attorney]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time (o)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held w/ PO ddl]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorneys ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Monthly Operating Report Summary]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing on Document Reset]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (miscellaneous)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Stipulated Motion]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion (sets obj deadline)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion (shortened time)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?313265
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =