open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-61307-can13
    Party Name:Ronald Troy Calhoun and Danetta Mary Calhoun [ABOVE MED]
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ntc Final Cure Mortgage Payment APPROVED]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitution Transfer of Claim (m)(o)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Determination of Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (o)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Confirming Amended Chapter 13 Plan (not initial)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [OSC 13 Plan - old form]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion Dismiss Case for Default]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:March 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Debtors Email Registration]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Pmts]
    Date Published:October 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Court Certificate of Service - text]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Court Certificate of Service w/drop downs]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Clerks Note re Ntc - public]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion to Dismiss Case for Default and 1322d]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitute Creditor Attorney - text only]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of 13 Plan Status]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Confirming Amended 13 Plan (NOT initial)(tm)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Schedules OR Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Address Added or Changed - text entry]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Setting Dividend (tm)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Confirming Amended 13 Plan - Initial (tm)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Plan Certification]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:March 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document Reset]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection to Claim (includes 30 day notice)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing Called and Continued]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Springfield Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Denying 13 Confirmation]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Trustee Objection to Exemptions - Ch 13]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Trustee Motion to Deny Confirmation]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Objection to Exemptions]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Amd Direct Debtor Pay]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Vacating the Dismissal and Reinstating Case (o)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income 22C-1]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Reinstate Case]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Generic Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?315676
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =