open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-60686-abf7
    Party Name:Anthony John Snincsak and Fancy Crystal Snincsak
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Close BK Case - All Chapter 7]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Final Account Zero Balance (TDR)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Order Approving Final Report & Distribution]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Notice & Summary of Final Report - Ch 7 (NFR)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Final Asset Report (TFR)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Compensation (o)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Trustee Interim Report (12 months)]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Creditors to File Claims]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Request for Claims Bar Date Notice]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Generic Order]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Continuance of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moon, Fred Charles [Certificate of Service (text entry)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?312300
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =