open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-30426-btf13
    Party Name:Christopher Michael Eichman - ABOVE MED
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ntc Final Cure Mortgage Payment APPROVED]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitute Creditor Attorney - text only]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Striking Doc - wrong event]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice - generic]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorneys ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Generic Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Confirming Amended 13 Plan (NOT initial)(tm)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Spend Income Tax Refund (o)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Amd Direct Debtor Pay]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [for Order (w/ 21 day notice)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post Confirmation Fees (o)]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Base Plan Increase]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post-Confirmation Fees]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Retain or Spend ALL of Income Tax Refund]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:August 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?313645
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =