open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-47186
    Party Name:Lauritta S. Stallings
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Trustee's Certification of Estate]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Approving Final Report & Account]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Order on UST Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice of Final Report - NFR]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [UST - Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice of Submitting Interim Report]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Final Cost Bill]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Request for Final Cost Bill]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice (Generic)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Compensation]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Compromise Controversy]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?377106
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =