open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:19-44041
    Party Name:Cathy Ann Kalamitsiotis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [**AUTO** Final Decree Auto Closing (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [**AUTO** AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:September 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [**AUTO** Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [none]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Blackwell, Robert J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee Tansfer Event for ADI]
    Date Published:February 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?378083
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =