open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-47980
    Party Name:James Michael McMillan and Katelyn Elaine McMillan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Trustee's Certification of Estate]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Approving Final Report & Account]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Order on UST Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [UST - Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Final Cost Bill]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Request for Final Cost Bill]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?378169
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =