open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-47718
    Party Name:William James Placke
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Final Decree Auto Closing (13)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Discharging Debtor Ch. 13 After Completion]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Final Cure Payment]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Notice of 522q Objection to Discharge Deadline]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Reminder Notice of Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Terminate Payroll Deduction (batch)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Return Excess Funds (batch)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Motion to Terminate Payroll Deduction (batch)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Motion to Return Excess Funds (batch)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [7-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents or Other Information]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Order on Motion Withdrawal of Counsel and Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdraw As Counsel and Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response to Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amend Plan]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Relief from Stay to Enter into Loan Modification Agreement]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee Tansfer Event for ADI]
    Date Published:February 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amend Plan]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Relief from Stay to Negotiate Mortgage Loan Modification]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Notice of Lack of Feasibility (batch)]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Avoid Lien]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?377853
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =