open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:20-42439
    Party Name:Michelle E Goebel
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [**AUTO** Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [**AUTO** Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Internet Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [**AUTO** Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Final Decree Auto Closing (13)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Discharging Debtor Ch. 13 After Completion]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Notice of 522q Objection to Discharge Deadline]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Reminder Notice of Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Terminate Payroll Deduction (batch)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Return Excess Funds (batch)]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Motion to Terminate Payroll Deduction (batch)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Motion to Return Excess Funds (batch)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [none]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw or Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?370481
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =