open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-20110
    Party Name:Davina Hughes
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Trustee's Certification of Estate]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Approving Final Report & Account]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Chapter 7 Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [UST - Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Notice of Final Report - NFR]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?372343
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =