open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:17-41456
    Party Name:Kyle F Goodrow
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion and Order Approving Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Adequate Protection]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:January 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Postpetition Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objecting to Discharge]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Official Form 122]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion Objecting to Discharge ยง 727(a)(8), (a)(9), and 1328 (f)]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [none]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Final Decree Auto Closing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Notice of Errors in Electronically Filed Documents - Refile Required]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [none]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Delay Discharge]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge and/or Dischargeability]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge and/or Dischargeability]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Debtor Failed to Appear)]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Amended Creditor Matrix and Verification of Matrix]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Extend Time]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [Chapter 13 Statement of Property on Conversion]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Case, E. Rebecca [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Dismiss Case - Failure to Turnover Tax Return]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Dismiss Case - Failure to Turnover Tax Return]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 7 Official Form 122]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [none]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Notice of Lack of Feasibility (batch)]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Turnover Tax Return (batch)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw or Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?374077
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =