open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-10796
    Party Name:Allan Keith Sanders and Debra Kay Sanders
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Final Decree]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Trustee's Certification of Estate]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Approving Final Report & Account]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Sell Property under Section 363(b)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Sell Property That is Not Free and Clear of Liens under 11 USC 363(f)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Order on UST Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Objection]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Notice of Final Report - NFR]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [UST - Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Chapter 7 Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Final Cost Bill]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Request for Final Cost Bill]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Debtor's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?376804
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =