open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:15-48373
    Party Name:Annie McNulty-Jennings
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Bounce Back E-mails]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [none]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Notice of Lack of Feasibility (batch)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Relief from Stay to Negotiate Mortgage Loan Modification]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:January 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Support/Supplement]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Turnover Tax Return (batch)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [B121 Form]
    Date Published:August 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13, All Schedules & Statements (fee)- case upload]
    Date Published:August 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:August 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Order Regarding Chapter 13 Statement of Property on Conversion]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Notice of Errors in Electronically Filed Documents - Refile Required]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Verification of Matrix and Matrix]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Response]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Property on Conversion]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [none]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Order and Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee Through Internet]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Postpetition Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Bounce Back E-mails]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [341 Meeting Continued - Payment Advice Documents Due]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Correspondence]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [B21 Form]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [B21 Form]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13, All Schedules & Statements (fee)- case upload]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Certification and Dismissal Request]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [none]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Errors in Electronically Filed Documents - Refile Required]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?363506
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =