open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:20-44329
    Party Name:Anita L. Jackson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [**AUTO** Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Internet Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [**AUTO** Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albin, Seth A [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruse, Fredrich J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?377765
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =