open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-47229
    Party Name:Nathaniel Fowler and Jacquelin R Fowler
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Final Decree Auto Closing]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [US Trustee Declination Statement Regarding Presumed Abuse]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Statement of Presumed Abuse (batch)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Order Regarding Chapter 13 Statement of Property on Conversion]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Official Form 122]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 13 Official Form 22]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Official Form 22]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Notice of Errors in Electronically Filed Documents - Refile Required]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Amended Creditor Matrix and Verification of Matrix]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Property on Conversion]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Amended Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [none]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Wage Order]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Wage Motion]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?377159
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =