open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:18-47833
    Party Name:Shirley Ann Lawson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Final Decree Auto Closing]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Response]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion and Order Approving Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Generic Motion]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [none]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [B121 Form]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Tracy A. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdraw As Counsel]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Borrow]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Borrow/Incur Debt]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Disposition of Adversary]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Compensation]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [7-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents or Other Information]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Order on Motion Withdrawal of Counsel and Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdraw As Counsel and Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Order (Generic)]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Notice of Postpetition Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Postpetition Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Notice of Lack of Feasibility (batch)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Errors in Electronically Filed Proof of Claim]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Debtor(s) or Trustee Proof of Claim]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Return Mail]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Verification of Matrix and Matrix]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:September 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Certification and Dismissal Request]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Bounce Back E-mails]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:March 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [none]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?347276
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =