open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:10-10490
    Party Name:Brian Edward Maloney and April Dawn Maloney
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [none]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Final Decree Auto Closing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Amended Motion for Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Relief from Stay (Amended)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:March 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [none]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, D. Matthew [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Final Decree]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Case Closed Without Discharge]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Reminder Notice of Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Terminate Payroll Deduction (batch)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Return Excess Funds (batch)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Retain Tax Refund]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Amend by Redaction]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?312600
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =