open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-30281-btf13
    Party Name:Mark Steven Purvis, II and Ashley Nicole Purvis ---Above Med---
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 9/11/12/13]
    Date Published:July 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:April 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Incur Debt]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Incur Debt (with 21 day notice)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [MoDOR - Ntc of Debtors Compliance re Tax Returns (text entry)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?311809
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =