open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-43487-can13
    Party Name:Jacob Isaac Boley and Alyssa Taylor Boley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Deposit Funds into Registry]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Support Documentation]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Incur Debt (no notice)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Schedules OR Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Vacating - generic (o)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Vacate]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion to Dismiss Case for 1322d]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Withdraw Document (text entry)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Court Certificate of Service - text]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Shorten Time (o)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitute Debtor Attorney (text entry)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Employ (o)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion to Dismiss Case for Default and 1322d]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Employ]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Pmts]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Confirming Amended 13 Plan (NOT initial)(tm)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Amd Direct Employer Pay]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Spend Income Tax Refund (o)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Compensation -Granted (o)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certificate of Service (text entry)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Incur Debt]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Consent to Motion to Expedite (text)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Expedite Hearing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Incur Debt for Vehicle (NO notice)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Retain or Spend ALL of Income Tax Refund]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of 13 Plan Status]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Compensation DENIED re 331]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Amd Direct Debtor Pay]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Address Added or Changed - text entry]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Compensation]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Setting Dividend]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Compensation (o)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Dismiss Case by MoDoR]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?315956
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =