open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-42934-can7
    Party Name:Lia H. Abramovitz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stanton, Janice E. [Close BK Case - All Chapter 7]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stanton, Janice E. [Relief from Stay (Rule 4001)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stanton, Janice E. [Ch 7 Report of No Distribution - No Funds (NDR)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stanton, Janice E. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stanton, Janice E. [Relief from Stay (Fee Due)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stanton, Janice E. [Trustee Interim Report (12 months)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stanton, Janice E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stanton, Janice E. [Address Added or Changed - text entry]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?314679
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =