open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-42960-can13
    Party Name:Denise D. Ballenger - ABOVE MED
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Address Added or Changed - text entry]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitution Transfer of Claim]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?314738
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =