open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:11-61936-abf13
    Party Name:Kenneth H Johnston-BELOW MED
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 11/12/13]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE-prior Dsch)(m)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certification of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?282029
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =