open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:12-21406-drd13
    Party Name:Jonathan Michael Durham - BELOW MED -
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 11/12/13]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (DISMISSAL)(m)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Pmts]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post-Confirmation Fees]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Address Added or Changed - text entry]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [DENY Conditionally Tr Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Agreed Trustee Continuance - multi]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion Dismiss Case for Default]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post Confirmation Fees (o)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?294700
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =