open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:14-60344-can13
    Party Name:Michael H Hess and Dana L Hess - BELOW MED
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 9/11/12/13]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Certification About a Financial Management Course (FMC)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Address Added or Changed - text entry]
    Date Published:December 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Returned Mail - text entry]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?310356
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =