open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:12-40022-abf13
    Party Name:Mildred A Hudson - BELOW MED -
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (DISMISSAL)(m) AMENDED]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Dismissal (AMENDED)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 11/12/13]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Substitute Creditor Attorney - text only]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (DISMISSAL)(m)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Deposit for Court Registry]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Deposit Funds into Registry]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Deposit Funds into Registry (m)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post Confirmation Fees (o)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Agreed Trustee Continuance]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post-Confirmation Fees]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Trustee Motion to Deny Confirmation]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Objection]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Tr Motion to Dismiss Case for 1322d]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice Allowing Amended 13 Claims by Trustee]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Suspend Plan Payments]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286130
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =