open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:13-cr-00036-1
    Party Name:USA v. Winters
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ Report: Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Satisfaction of Judgment (Fine/Costs/Restitution)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark ]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Waiver (Post Hearing)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Waiver (Prior to Hearing)]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report: Reduction of Sentence Amendment 782 Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?110416
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =