open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:20-cr-00183-1
    Party Name:USA v. Jordan
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Writ]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:July 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea and Sentencing Hearing Combined]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Digital Audio File]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing / Re-Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Computation Summary - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Warrant/Summons - 12C]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended: Relief re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Court]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count/Case]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ Report: Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Count/Case]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Entry of Felony Plea Before Magistrate]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript - Suppression Hearing]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Support]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Project EARN Sanction Order]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript (FILED UNDER SEAL)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [BOP Designation]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Examination or Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:June 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:June 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond (Set/Revoke/Forfeit)]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Withdrawal Pretrial Motion Hearing (Rules Motions)]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Execution]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supervised Release/Probation Revocation Sentencing Computation - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation or Prob/Sup Release or Pretrial Action]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter of Transfer In]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Retroactive Application of Sentencing Guidelines re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report: Reduction of Sentence Amendment 782 Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Waiver (Post Hearing)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Waiver (Prior to Hearing)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:August 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip]
    Date Published:April 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:February 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:November 25, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?81489
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =