open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-01455
    Party Name:Bailey v. Valarity LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney/Law Firm]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135303
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =