open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:09-cv-01252
    Party Name:Jo Ann Howard and Associates, P.C. et al v. Cassity et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notification of Designated Clerk's Record]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Generic - will NOT rule a motion or term case/party)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Notification from USCA]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clarify]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Post Trial Brief]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bench Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Directed Verdict]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Relief]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Miscellaneous Relief)]
    Date Published:December 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Court Hearing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bench Trial - Resumed but not Concluded]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bench Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:November 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Interrogatory Answer List]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exclude]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Pretrial]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deposition Designations]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Depose]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order - Amended]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA JUDGMENT]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Court]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Cross Appeal]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs Taxed]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Ruling]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney/Firm]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [File in Excess of Page Limitation]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?101368
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =