open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:12-cv-00361
    Party Name:McClurg et al v. MI Holdings, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Court Hearing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Conference]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Limited/Special Appearance]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [File in Excess of Page Limitation]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:May 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:March 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Relief]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Scheduling Plan]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sever]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Generic - will NOT rule a motion or term case/party)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Ruling]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:November 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report To Court Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney/Firm]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:September 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order - Amended]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clarify]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (to termed motion)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [ADR Pro Bono Limited Scope Counsel]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Party]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestion of Death]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118866
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =