open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:13-cv-01043
    Party Name:Emerson Electric Co. v. Suzhou Cleva Electric Applicance Co., Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report (Final) re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Pretrial]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exclude]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Requests for Admissions List]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Interrogatory Answer List]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deposition Designations]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order - Amended]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Permanent Injunction]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?127299
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =