open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-01330
    Party Name:Abney v. City of St. Charles, MO Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Mediation]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?134967
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =