open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:10-cr-00261-1
    Party Name:USA v. Woodard
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:July 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Preliminary Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prelminary Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (Financial)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Payment Voucher for Attorney Appointment]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Not Call Witnesses at Sentencing]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Determination of Admissibility]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:April 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver/Withdrawal of Pretrial Motions (MLM)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 18, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?136364
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =