open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-01928
    Party Name:J.W. v. Ferguson et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [ADR Compliance Report]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appointment of Neutral]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Scheduling Plan]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 16 Order]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:December 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Case]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report To Court Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?136621
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =