open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-01015
    Party Name:Imperial Zinc Corp. v. Strauss et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report To Court Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Case]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure of Organizational Interests]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order - Amended]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Scheduling Plan]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney/Firm]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to ADR]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?134039
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =