open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:2:13-cv-04150
    Party Name:Rosenthal v. Missouri Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Order of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to order]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Suggestions to Motion (Sealed)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?109740
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =