open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:15-cv-00834
    Party Name:Newkirk v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security reply brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by defendant]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:May 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Social Security complaint]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission of administrative record]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment Returned]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Social Security]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?110987
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =