open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:6:16-cv-03426
    Party Name:Mills v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Social Security]
    Date Published:September 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Social Security complaint]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission of administrative record]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of service of Social Security Complaint]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:September 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security reply brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by defendant]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115855
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =