open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-01029
    Party Name:Lyne v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of service of Social Security Complaint]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security reply brief by plaintiff]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security brief by defendant]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Social Security]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118766
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =