open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:2:09-cv-04111
    Party Name:Dinkins v. Correctional Medical Service et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Inmate Account Statement]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Instructions Given/Refused]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Verdict]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Held]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Selection]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Begun]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury List]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Agreed Upon Statement]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Voir Dire Questions]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Order]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment Returned]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Memorandum]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Magistrate Assignment]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:October 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?90619
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =