open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:6:14-cv-03184
    Party Name:KNL Construction, Inc. v. Killian Construction Co., Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Case]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Green card (return)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to answer]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?114917
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =