open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:03-cr-00562-1
    Party Name:USA v. Wiles
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Returned Executed/Unexecuted]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 09, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?112124
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =