open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:16-cv-00775
    Party Name:Frasher v. USA
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Green card (return)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?117023
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =