open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:2:13-cr-04036-2
    Party Name:USA v. Burwell et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Entry of Felony Plea Before Magistrate]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?110539
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =