open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:13-cv-00202
    Party Name:General Casualty Company of Wisconsin v. Scot Heller Trucking Company, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestions in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of MAPADMIN]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?108254
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =